THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 08:27:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-210 Lorraine Ave
Kitchener ON N2B 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 570-1223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spadotto Mee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spadotto (CPSO#: 100627 ) Dr. R. Mee (CPSO#: 100628 )
Business Address: Suite 103
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 579-4870

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-210 Lorraine Ave
Kitchener ON N2B 3T4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 570-1223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spadotto Mee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spadotto (CPSO#: 100627 ) Dr. R. Mee (CPSO#: 100628 )
Business Address: Suite 103
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E9
(519) 579-4870

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LYNN SPADOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADOTTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE LYNN SPADOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADOTTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013