THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:11:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2120 Regent Street
Suite 7
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 885-9070
Fax: (705) 479-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart M. K. McGregor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McGregor (CPSO#: 100646 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2120 Regent Street
Suite 7
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 885-9070

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2120 Regent Street
Suite 7
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 885-9070
Fax: (705) 479-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stuart M. K. McGregor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. McGregor (CPSO#: 100646 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2120 Regent Street
Suite 7
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Z9
(705) 885-9070

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART MALCOLM KENNEDY MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STUART MALCOLM KENNEDY MCGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013