THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Marys Wellness Centre
268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192843450
Fax: 519-284-2125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T Foster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Foster (CPSO#: 100654 )
Business Address: St Mary's Wellness Centre
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Marys Wellness Centre
268 Maiden Lane
St. Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192843450
Fax: 519-284-2125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
HOSPITAL: St Mary's Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: St Marys

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T Foster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Foster (CPSO#: 100654 )
Business Address: St Mary's Wellness Centre
268 Maiden Lane
St Marys Ontario N4X 1B7
(519) 284-3450

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAMARA FOSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOSTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013