THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:03:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, FUZHOU, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Gordon St
Nephrologist Office, LH Whitby
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-444-6688
Fax: 905-444-6687
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 8A2
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhu (CPSO#: 100661 )
Business Address: 300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, FUZHOU, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Gordon St
Nephrologist Office, LH Whitby
Whitby ON L1N 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-444-6688
Fax: 905-444-6687
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON L1G 8A2
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhu (CPSO#: 100661 )
Business Address: 300 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5T2
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN XIAO GUANG ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN XIAO GUANG ZHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013