THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:38:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 901-7166
Fax: (416) 234-0904
Address: 50 McIntosh Drive
unit 103
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Phone: 2893785077
Fax: 289-807-0597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Zhang (CPSO#: 100665 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Address: Suite 202
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(416) 233-1271
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 901-7166
Fax: (416) 234-0904
Address: 50 McIntosh Drive
unit 103
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Phone: 2893785077
Fax: 289-807-0597

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Zhang (CPSO#: 100665 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Address: Suite 202
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 5N2
(416) 233-1271
Business Address: 750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIAXIN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIAXIN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013