THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:33:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c1-34 Highbury Park Drive
Mosaic Clinic
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138255995
Fax: 6132128992
Address: 401-116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3
Phone: 613-216-3932
Fax: 613-216-3930
Address: Maple
NA-House Calls
Toronto Ontario M5V1S2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Littman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Littman (CPSO#: 100674 )
Business Address: Advanced Access Medical Clinics
Unit 7
3091 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4R9
(613) 825-5995

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c1-34 Highbury Park Drive
Mosaic Clinic
Ottawa Ontario K2J 5C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138255995
Fax: 6132128992
Address: 401-116 Albert St
Ottawa ON K1P 5G3
Phone: 613-216-3932
Fax: 613-216-3930
Address: Maple
NA-House Calls
Toronto Ontario M5V1S2
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: (888) 745-0435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Littman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Littman (CPSO#: 100674 )
Business Address: Advanced Access Medical Clinics
Unit 7
3091 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 4R9
(613) 825-5995

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN MICHAEL LITTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN MICHAEL LITTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013