THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 01:39:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2-650
800 Commisssioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa J. Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huynh (CPSO#: 100689 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Room E2-650
London ON N6A 5W9
519-685-8500 Extn: 58451

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Room E2-650
800 Commisssioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa J. Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huynh (CPSO#: 100689 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
Room E2-650
London ON N6A 5W9
519-685-8500 Extn: 58451

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA JESSICA HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA JESSICA HUYNH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUYNH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013