THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - UH
Department of Internal Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 33362
Fax: 519-663-3241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jones (CPSO#: 100692 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - UH
Department of Internal Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8500
Extension: 33362
Fax: 519-663-3241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jones (CPSO#: 100692 )
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY BENTLEY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY BENTLEY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013