THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Department of Emergency Medicine
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Dundas Street West
Belleville Ontario K8P 1A1
Phone: 613-779-0044
Fax: 613-968-6303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. CASSIDY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cassidy (CPSO#: 100694 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Department Of Emergency Medicine
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 265 Dundas St E
Department of Emergency Medicine
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2 Dundas Street West
Belleville Ontario K8P 1A1
Phone: 613-779-0044
Fax: 613-968-6303

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Health Belleville
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. CASSIDY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cassidy (CPSO#: 100694 )
Business Address: 265 Dundas St E
Department Of Emergency Medicine
Belleville ON K8N 5A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSEY JANE CASSIDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELSEY JANE CASSIDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASSIDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013