THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grimsby Family Medical Centre
150 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Ysselstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ysselstein (CPSO#: 100705 )
Business Address: 1-150 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P1

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Ysselstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grimsby Family Medical Centre
150 Main Street East
Grimsby Ontario L3M 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 945-5424
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Ysselstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ysselstein (CPSO#: 100705 )
Business Address: 1-150 Main St E
Grimsby ON L3M 1P1

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Ysselstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC YSSELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YSSELSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC YSSELSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YSSELSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013