THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-240 Wharncliffe Rd N
London ON N6H 4P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196012004
Fax: 2266366004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hommel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hommel (CPSO#: 100716 )
Business Address: Synergy Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London Ontario N6H 5L7
(519) 266-3600
Business Address: 1070 Gainsborough Rd
Unit 1B
London ON N6H 5L5
519-601-2004

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-240 Wharncliffe Rd N
London ON N6H 4P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196012004
Fax: 2266366004

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hommel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hommel (CPSO#: 100716 )
Business Address: Synergy Centre
1635 Hyde Park Road
London Ontario N6H 5L7
(519) 266-3600
Business Address: 1070 Gainsborough Rd
Unit 1B
London ON N6H 5L5
519-601-2004

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL PATRICK HOMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOMMEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL PATRICK HOMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOMMEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013