THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5292 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-775-0790
Fax: 855-490-9535
Address: Seneca College - Student Health
1750 Finch Ave. East
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Verbora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Verbora (CPSO#: 100717 )
Business Address: 1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
Business Address: CMC
Unit 407
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 3A1
(647) 406-4902

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5292 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-775-0790
Fax: 855-490-9535
Address: Seneca College - Student Health
1750 Finch Ave. East
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Verbora Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Verbora (CPSO#: 100717 )
Business Address: 1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
Business Address: CMC
Unit 407
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M4P 3A1
(647) 406-4902

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN VERBORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBORA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN VERBORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBORA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013