THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:45:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 9
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-324-8212
Fax: 705-324-8223
Address: 28 Boyd St
Bobcaygeon Ontario K0M 1A0
Phone: (705) 738-2374
Fax: (705) 738-3821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Millson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Millson (CPSO#: 100746 )
Business Address: Lindsay Professional Building
Suite 9
65 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5N7
(705) 324-8212
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: Case Manor
28 Boyd Street
Bobcaygeon Ontario K0M 1A0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 9
65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-324-8212
Fax: 705-324-8223
Address: 28 Boyd St
Bobcaygeon Ontario K0M 1A0
Phone: (705) 738-2374
Fax: (705) 738-3821

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Millson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Millson (CPSO#: 100746 )
Business Address: Lindsay Professional Building
Suite 9
65 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 5N7
(705) 324-8212
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: Case Manor
28 Boyd Street
Bobcaygeon Ontario K0M 1A0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA BONNIE JANE MILLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA BONNIE JANE MILLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013