THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:55:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
711 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BALITSKY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Balitsky (CPSO#: 100770 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Cancer Centre
711 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 09 Nov 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BALITSKY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Balitsky (CPSO#: 100770 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMARIS KARIN SARAH BALITSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALITSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMARIS KARIN SARAH BALITSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALITSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013