THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:03:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Respiratory Services
Suite 3
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)544-7910
Fax: (613) 542-0746

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davis (CPSO#: 100779 )
Business Address: 725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M7E4
6135447910

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Respiratory Services
Suite 3
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613)544-7910
Fax: (613) 542-0746

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Davis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Davis (CPSO#: 100779 )
Business Address: 725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston Ontario K7M7E4
6135447910

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013