THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3146 Laura Dr unit 3
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-590-2550
Fax: 705-590-2570
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northwood
2009 Long Lake road unit 101
Sudbury Ontario P3E6C3
Phone: (705)522-3380
Fax: (705)522-1797

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherri-Leann Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3146 Laura Dr unit 3
Chelmsford ON P0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-590-2550
Fax: 705-590-2570
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Northwood
2009 Long Lake road unit 101
Sudbury Ontario P3E6C3
Phone: (705)522-3380
Fax: (705)522-1797

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sherri-Leann Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERRI-LEANN KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERRI-LEANN KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013