THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:38:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 850 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055267137
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Dec 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph J. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oliver (CPSO#: 100794 )
Business Address: 850 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1K3
9055237137

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 850 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055267137
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 07 Dec 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph J. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oliver (CPSO#: 100794 )
Business Address: 850 King Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 1K3
9055237137

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH JAMES OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH JAMES OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013