THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1289A Gerrard St E
Toronto Rheumatology
Toronto ON M4L 1Y8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-778-8885
Fax: 416-848-4125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Piche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Piche (CPSO#: 100804 )
Business Address: 1289 A Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 1Y8
416-778-8885

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Piche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-1289A Gerrard St E
Toronto Rheumatology
Toronto ON M4L 1Y8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416-778-8885
Fax: 416-848-4125

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Piche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Piche (CPSO#: 100804 )
Business Address: 1289 A Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M4L 1Y8
416-778-8885

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Piche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW PICHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW PICHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013