THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:18:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabrielli Rust Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rust (CPSO#: 100814 ) Dr. L. Gabrielli (CPSO#: 100678 )
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 176 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health
St. Catharines Site
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabrielli Rust Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rust (CPSO#: 100814 ) Dr. L. Gabrielli (CPSO#: 100678 )
Business Address: 230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1Z2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: Niagara Health System
Welland Hospital Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 176 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Address: 260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne Ontario L3K 2N7
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health
St. Catharines Site
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER RUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER RUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013