THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:45:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1-500, 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6731
Fax: 416-480-6757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St. Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Dengler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dengler (CPSO#: 100816 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
M1-500
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416-480-6731

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1-500, 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6731
Fax: 416-480-6757

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: St. Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Lyndhurst Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Dengler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dengler (CPSO#: 100816 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
M1-500
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
416-480-6731

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANA DENGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENGLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANA DENGLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENGLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013