THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: TBRHSC
Dept. of Critical Care Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Dep. of Critical Care Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AARON RUBERTO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ruberto (CPSO#: 100828 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Address: 1100 Memorial Ave
Pmb #180
Thunder Bay ON P7B 4A3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: TBRHSC
Dept. of Critical Care Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Dep. of Critical Care Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AARON RUBERTO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ruberto (CPSO#: 100828 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Business Address: 1100 Memorial Ave
Pmb #180
Thunder Bay ON P7B 4A3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON JEDEDIAH RUBERTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBERTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON JEDEDIAH RUBERTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBERTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013