THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:51:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-5099
Fax: 705 726 8063

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Hachey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dickinson (CPSO#: 100878 ) Dr. J. Hachey (CPSO#: 100864 )
Business Address: 304-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
705 503 9133
Business Address: Orillia Paediatric Teaching Associates
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 327-9131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 305-190 Cundles Rd E
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-5099
Fax: 705 726 8063

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Hachey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Dickinson (CPSO#: 100878 ) Dr. J. Hachey (CPSO#: 100864 )
Business Address: 304-5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
705 503 9133
Business Address: Orillia Paediatric Teaching Associates
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 327-9131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DANIEL HACHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACHEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DANIEL HACHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACHEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013