THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 432 George Street North
Rapid Access Addictions Medicine
Peterborough Regional Health Center
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 749-9708
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 210 Wolfe Street
Bridges Clinic
Peterborough Street Medicine APP
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2K9
Phone: 7059774669
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6853
Fax: (705) 741-6513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lehmann-Bender Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 432 George Street North
Rapid Access Addictions Medicine
Peterborough Regional Health Center
Peterborough Ontario K9H 3R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 749-9708
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 210 Wolfe Street
Bridges Clinic
Peterborough Street Medicine APP
Peterborough Ontario K9J 2K9
Phone: 7059774669
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6853
Fax: (705) 741-6513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lehmann-Bender Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITT MORISSA LEHMANN-BENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEHMANN-BENDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITT MORISSA LEHMANN-BENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEHMANN-BENDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013