THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:20:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit E
All About Health
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive E
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jiang (CPSO#: 100879 )
Business Address: All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5T2
(905) 884-0666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit E
All About Health
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive E
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jiang (CPSO#: 100879 )
Business Address: All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5T2
(905) 884-0666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIANXIN JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIANXIN JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013