THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Springbank Family Medical Centre
Old South FHO
460 Springbank Drive
Suite #306B
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196610047
Fax: 5196610917

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kreuzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kreuzer (CPSO#: 100883 )
Business Address: Suite 306B
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 661-0047
Business Address: 306B-460 Springbank Drive
London ON N6J 2A8
5196610047
Business Address: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 306B
London Ontario N6J 0A8
5196610047

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Springbank Family Medical Centre
Old South FHO
460 Springbank Drive
Suite #306B
London Ontario N6J 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196610047
Fax: 5196610917

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kreuzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kreuzer (CPSO#: 100883 )
Business Address: Suite 306B
460 Springbank Drive
London Ontario N6J 0A8
(519) 661-0047
Business Address: 306B-460 Springbank Drive
London ON N6J 2A8
5196610047
Business Address: 460 Springbank Drive
Suite 306B
London Ontario N6J 0A8
5196610047

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DAVID KREUZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREUZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL DAVID KREUZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREUZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013