THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:30:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1272 Wellington St W
Ottawa ON K1Y 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138291266
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAMUEL HETZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hetz (CPSO#: 100892 )
Business Address: 1272 Wellington St W
Ottawa ON K1Y 3A7
613-829-1266

Corporation Name: Hetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1272 Wellington St W
Ottawa ON K1Y 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138291266
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SAMUEL HETZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hetz (CPSO#: 100892 )
Business Address: 1272 Wellington St W
Ottawa ON K1Y 3A7
613-829-1266

Corporation Name: Hetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL PETER HETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HETZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL PETER HETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HETZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013