THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 429 Maclaren St
Centre for Health Innovation
Ottawa ON K2P 0M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orleans Urgent Care Centre
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Orléans Ontario K1C7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Integrate Healthcare Collective
102 Lewis Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0S7
Phone: 613-230-7891
Fax: 613-569-1831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ADRIENNE JUNEK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Junek (CPSO#: 100893 )
Business Address: 429 Maclaren St
Ottawa ON K2P 0M7
613-792-1222
Business Address: 1220 Dr Place d'Orleans
Orléans ON K1C 7K3
613-841-5389
Business Address: 102 Lewis St
Ottawa ON K2P 0S7
613-230-7891

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 429 Maclaren St
Centre for Health Innovation
Ottawa ON K2P 0M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Orleans Urgent Care Centre
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Orléans Ontario K1C7K3
Phone: (613) 841-5389
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Integrate Healthcare Collective
102 Lewis Street
Ottawa Ontario K2P 0S7
Phone: 613-230-7891
Fax: 613-569-1831

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ADRIENNE JUNEK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Junek (CPSO#: 100893 )
Business Address: 429 Maclaren St
Ottawa ON K2P 0M7
613-792-1222
Business Address: 1220 Dr Place d'Orleans
Orléans ON K1C 7K3
613-841-5389
Business Address: 102 Lewis St
Ottawa ON K2P 0S7
613-230-7891

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE JUNEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIENNE JUNEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013