THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 17:42:16 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 329-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055539545
Fax: 2899631083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen H. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chen (CPSO#: 100910 )
Business Address: 9401 Jane Street
Unit 329
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
9055539545

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 329-9401 Jane Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055539545
Fax: 2899631083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 05 Apr 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
Oak Valley Health Markham
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen H. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chen (CPSO#: 100910 )
Business Address: 9401 Jane Street
Unit 329
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4H7
9055539545

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN HUANG-TING CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN HUANG-TING CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013