THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:42:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 08 Aug 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Kilian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilian (CPSO#: 100927 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: North York General Hospital
RM 1NW-126
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6165
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 08 Aug 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Kilian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilian (CPSO#: 100927 )
Business Address: 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-1500
Business Address: North York General Hospital
RM 1NW-126
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT KILIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT KILIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 08 Feb 2024
Summary:
Charges

Michael Kilian was charged with the following offence:

1.  4 Counts of Voyeurism, on or about February 1, 2024, contrary to section 162(1)(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  February 8, 2024 
Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services


Source: Other
Effective Date: 07 Feb 2024
Summary:
Conditions of Release

On February 7, 2024, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Michael Kilian:

1.  Kilian must notify police of any change to his address, employment or occupation.
2.  Kilian must not go to 907 Kingston Rd, Toronto (YMCA).
3.  Kilian must not use any digital device, including cellular phones for the purpose of taking photos or videos, except for work purposes.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 08 Feb 2024
Summary:
Charges

Michael Kilian was charged with the following offence:

1.  4 Counts of Voyeurism, on or about February 1, 2024, contrary to section 162(1)(c) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  February 8, 2024 
Place of Charge:  Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services


Source: Other
Effective Date: 07 Feb 2024
Summary:
Conditions of Release

On February 7, 2024, the following Conditions of Release were imposed on Michael Kilian:

1.  Kilian must notify police of any change to his address, employment or occupation.
2.  Kilian must not go to 907 Kingston Rd, Toronto (YMCA).
3.  Kilian must not use any digital device, including cellular phones for the purpose of taking photos or videos, except for work purposes.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013