THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: Burgess, Jennifer Leigh (Used Until: 04 May 2014)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Primacy Clinic
1485 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-7451
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Laurentian University
Health & Wellness Services
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Phone: 7056736546
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer L. McGarry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGarry (CPSO#: 100935 )
Business Address: 1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
(705) 222-7451
Business Address: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7

General Information

Former Name: Burgess, Jennifer Leigh (Used Until: 04 May 2014)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Primacy Clinic
1485 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-7451
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Laurentian University
Health & Wellness Services
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Phone: 7056736546
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer L. McGarry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McGarry (CPSO#: 100935 )
Business Address: 1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury Ontario P3A 5H7
(705) 222-7451
Business Address: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEIGH MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEIGH MCGARRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGARRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013