THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:57:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob A. Pace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pace (CPSO#: 100945 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 189 Elm St
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob A. Pace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pace (CPSO#: 100945 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ANTHONY PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACOB ANTHONY PACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013