THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:22:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057238551
Fax: 9057216663

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gaschler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gaschler (CPSO#: 100950 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057238551
Fax: 9057216663

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gaschler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gaschler (CPSO#: 100950 )
Business Address: 47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 2N4
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON JOHN GASCHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASCHLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON JOHN GASCHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GASCHLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013