THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary’s General Hospital
Arrhythmia Clinic
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-749-6578
Extension: 1500
Fax: 519-749-6589
Address: 207-564 Belmont Ave W
Medi-Share Cardiology
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: 519-576-6410
Fax: 519-576-9271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan (CPSO#: 100956 )
Business Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Arrhythmia Clinic
St. Mary's General Hospital
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
519-749-6578 Extn: 1500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
St. Mary’s General Hospital
Arrhythmia Clinic
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-749-6578
Extension: 1500
Fax: 519-749-6589
Address: 207-564 Belmont Ave W
Medi-Share Cardiology
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: 519-576-6410
Fax: 519-576-9271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Chan (CPSO#: 100956 )
Business Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Arrhythmia Clinic
St. Mary's General Hospital
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
519-749-6578 Extn: 1500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM KA-BO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM KA-BO CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013