THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:01:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056378833
Fax: 9056376745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaisy Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yang (CPSO#: 100962 )
Business Address: 116 - 1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
(289) 837-3449
Business Address: 203-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056378833
Fax: 9056376745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaisy Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yang (CPSO#: 100962 )
Business Address: 116 - 1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
(289) 837-3449
Business Address: 203-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAISY JIAN JIAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAISY JIAN JIAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013