THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:20:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2315 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON L1X 1V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 839-5151
Fax: (905) 839-5556
Address: 3276 Saint Clair Avenue East
Providence Healthcare
Houses of Providence
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Extension: 3605
Fax: 416-285-3659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie W.Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong (CPSO#: 100968 )
Business Address: 2315 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON L1X 1V4
(905) 839-5151

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2315 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON L1X 1V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 839-5151
Fax: (905) 839-5556
Address: 3276 Saint Clair Avenue East
Providence Healthcare
Houses of Providence
Toronto Ontario M1L 1W1
Phone: 416-285-3666
Extension: 3605
Fax: 416-285-3659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalie W.Y. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong (CPSO#: 100968 )
Business Address: 2315 Liverpool Rd
Pickering ON L1X 1V4
(905) 839-5151

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE WAI-YING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIE WAI-YING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013