THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TIMOTHY LUSSIER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lussier (CPSO#: 100984 )
Business Address: 45 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
9055768711

Corporation Name: Timothy Lussier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TIMOTHY LUSSIER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lussier (CPSO#: 100984 )
Business Address: 45 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A2
9055768711

Corporation Name: Timothy Lussier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY MICHAEL LUSSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSSIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY MICHAEL LUSSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUSSIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2013