THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:19:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2153 Armstrong St
Sudbury ON P3E 4W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-419-2612
Fax: 705-419-2614
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristie Herranen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Herranen (CPSO#: 100990 )
Business Address: 3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
(705) 855-1018
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2153 Armstrong St
Sudbury ON P3E 4W2
7054192612

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2153 Armstrong St
Sudbury ON P3E 4W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-419-2612
Fax: 705-419-2614
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristie Herranen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Herranen (CPSO#: 100990 )
Business Address: 3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
(705) 855-1018
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2153 Armstrong St
Sudbury ON P3E 4W2
7054192612

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIE DIANE HERRANEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRANEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTIE DIANE HERRANEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRANEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013