THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:34:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 44 rue St-Christophe,
Unit 2,
Noëlville ON P0M 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 898 2594
Fax: 705 898 3106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Feb 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noemie Robert Lajeunesse Medicine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Robert Lajeunesse (CPSO#: 100992 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 44 rue St-Christophe,
Unit 2,
Noëlville ON P0M 2N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 898 2594
Fax: 705 898 3106

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Feb 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Noemie Robert Lajeunesse Medicine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Robert Lajeunesse (CPSO#: 100992 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOEMIE ANGELE ROBERT LAJEUNESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT LAJEUNESSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOEMIE ANGELE ROBERT LAJEUNESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT LAJEUNESSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013