THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: Villano, Liane (Used Until: 19 Sep 2017)
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Espanola Family Health Team
801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 862-7991
Fax: 7058627157

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liane Ainslie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ainslie (CPSO#: 100994 )
Business Address: Espanola Family Health Team
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-1420
Business Address: 801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1T2
(705) 862-7991

General Information

Former Name: Villano, Liane (Used Until: 19 Sep 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Espanola Family Health Team
801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 862-7991
Fax: 7058627157

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liane Ainslie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ainslie (CPSO#: 100994 )
Business Address: Espanola Family Health Team
825 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1R4
(705) 869-1420
Business Address: 801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola Ontario P5E 1T2
(705) 862-7991

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE AINSLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AINSLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE AINSLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AINSLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013