THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217-1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-1311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Dundas St West, # 106
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1H3
Phone: (905) 275-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lee (CPSO#: 101000 )
Business Address: 2-80 King St
St Catharines ON L2R 7G1
1-888-256-7043
Business Address: 302 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N8
(289) 217-7947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217-1371 Neilson Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 281-1311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 250 Dundas St West, # 106
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1H3
Phone: (905) 275-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y.S. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lee (CPSO#: 101000 )
Business Address: 2-80 King St
St Catharines ON L2R 7G1
1-888-256-7043
Business Address: 302 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3N8
(289) 217-7947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YONG SUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YONG SUN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013