THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:29:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site Richards Landing
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site
LOCATION: Richards Landing

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Evans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Evans (CPSO#: 101003 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Aug 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site Richards Landing
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospitals Richard's Landing Site
LOCATION: Richards Landing

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Evans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Evans (CPSO#: 101003 )
Business Address: Sault Area Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
(705) 759-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP CHARLES EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILLIP CHARLES EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013