THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:33:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Suite 102
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-7342
Fax: (705) 222-7341

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mikael R. L. Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levesque (CPSO#: 101004 )
Business Address: 102 - 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
(705) 222-7342

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Suite 102
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 222-7342
Fax: (705) 222-7341

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mikael R. L. Levesque Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Levesque (CPSO#: 101004 )
Business Address: 102 - 430 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K7
(705) 222-7342

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKAEL RENE LIONEL LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIKAEL RENE LIONEL LEVESQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVESQUE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013