THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:22:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique Medicale Wateridge Medical Clinic
1740 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1J 6N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-366-2605
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.M. Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Morris (CPSO#: 101008 )
Business Address: 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298
Business Address: Montreal Rd
Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1J 6N3
613-366-2605

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinique Medicale Wateridge Medical Clinic
1740 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1J 6N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-366-2605
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.M. Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Morris (CPSO#: 101008 )
Business Address: 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298
Business Address: Montreal Rd
Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1J 6N3
613-366-2605

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH MELODY MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH MELODY MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013