THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:33:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
99 Toronto Road
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-885-5511
Fax: 289-436-0120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Everdell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Everdell (CPSO#: 101034 )
Business Address: 390 King Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 4K6
(905) 372-5451
Business Address: 99 Toronto Road
200 - 203
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S4
(905) 885-0611
Business Address: 1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
99 Toronto Road
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-885-5511
Fax: 289-436-0120

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Everdell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Everdell (CPSO#: 101034 )
Business Address: 390 King Street East
Cobourg Ontario K9A 4K6
(905) 372-5451
Business Address: 99 Toronto Road
200 - 203
Port Hope Ontario L1A 3S4
(905) 885-0611
Business Address: 1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
(905) 372-6811

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE ELIZABETH EVERDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERDELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE ELIZABETH EVERDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVERDELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013