THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350 Highway 7 E
Suite PH5
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056245527
Fax: 2898702010
Address: 2280 Ontario 12
Brechin Ontario L0K 1B0
Phone: (437) 266-9221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vardhamaan Ricky Vasant Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sheth (CPSO#: 101039 )
Business Address: Ph 5-350 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N2
9056245527

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 350 Highway 7 E
Suite PH5
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056245527
Fax: 2898702010
Address: 2280 Ontario 12
Brechin Ontario L0K 1B0
Phone: (437) 266-9221
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vardhamaan Ricky Vasant Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sheth (CPSO#: 101039 )
Business Address: Ph 5-350 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3N2
9056245527

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICKY VARDHAMAAN VASANT SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICKY VARDHAMAAN VASANT SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013