THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:01:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington, ON
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 681 4888
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abubaker Khalifa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khalifa (CPSO#: 101040 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington, ON
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 681 4888
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abubaker Khalifa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khalifa (CPSO#: 101040 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABUBAKER KHALIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIFA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABUBAKER KHALIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIFA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013