THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:14:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Dept of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hernandez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hernandez (CPSO#: 101044 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Dept of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1230 North Shore Blvd E
Burlington Ontario L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hernandez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hernandez (CPSO#: 101044 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Department of Emergency Medicine
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY MARK HERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY MARK HERNANDEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERNANDEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013