THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-753-9581
Fax: 519-753-9547
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 1-519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Major Galasso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Major Galasso (CPSO#: 101045 )
Business Address: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
5197539581
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Brantford Medical Centre
40 Shellington Place
Brantford Ontario N3C 0C5
(519) 751-0746

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-753-9581
Fax: 519-753-9547
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 1-519-751-5544
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Major Galasso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Major Galasso (CPSO#: 101045 )
Business Address: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
5197539581
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Brantford Medical Centre
40 Shellington Place
Brantford Ontario N3C 0C5
(519) 751-0746

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MAJOR GALASSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR GALASSO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MAJOR GALASSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR GALASSO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013