THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:44:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3319 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-257-3319
Fax: 647-689-2375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Ramakrishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ramakrishna (CPSO#: 101068 )
Business Address: 877 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4C4
Business Address: 1157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3319 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-257-3319
Fax: 647-689-2375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Ramakrishna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ramakrishna (CPSO#: 101068 )
Business Address: 877 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M6N 4C4
Business Address: 1157 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M5C 1X7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA PADMA RAMAKRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAKRISHNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA PADMA RAMAKRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAKRISHNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013