THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
PureSkin Dermatology
London Ontario N6P 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-913-2897
Fax: 519-913-2899
Address: 417 Hibernia St
Stratford ON N5A 5W2
Phone: 519-913-2897
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tania Bhanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bhanji (CPSO#: 101084 )
Business Address: Skin Disorders Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Box 160
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
(519) 913-2897
Business Address: 378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Address: London Lambeth Medical Clinic
2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 0B3
(519) 842-3994

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GUJARATI
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
PureSkin Dermatology
London Ontario N6P 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-913-2897
Fax: 519-913-2899
Address: 417 Hibernia St
Stratford ON N5A 5W2
Phone: 519-913-2897
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tania Bhanji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Bhanji (CPSO#: 101084 )
Business Address: Skin Disorders Clinic
36 Heritage Drive
Box 160
Ilderton Ontario N0M 2A0
(519) 913-2897
Business Address: 378 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 5T5
Business Address: London Lambeth Medical Clinic
2-3090 Colonel Talbot Road
London Ontario N6P 0B3
(519) 842-3994

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANIA BHANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TANIA BHANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHANJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013